Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the notice requirements for an applicant for a new alcoholic beverages license or changes to an existing license in Howard County; requiring the Howard County Board of License Commissioners to publish a certain hearing notice on the Board's website for at least 15 days before the hearing on an application; requiring the Board to provide a notice of a hearing on an application to the Howard County Office of Public Information; and requiring the Office of Public Information to post the hearing notice in the same manner as other meeting notices.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {653322/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 773
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:40 PM
Click to return on the top page