Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the father of a child to file a petition to add the father's surname to the child's name under certain circumstances and establishing related court procedures; and requiring the Maryland Judiciary to develop and update, as appropriate, a training program for judges presiding over petitions filed under the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Paternity - Surname (Maryland Paternal Naming Rights Act)
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/29/2024 2/29/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/12/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   5-1049 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:25 PM
Click to return on the top page