Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Atterbeary and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the school leadership training program developed by the State Department of Education and the Accountability and Implementation Board to require that the State Superintendent, county superintendents, and senior instruction-related staff complete the training at least once; combining two leadership trainings into a single training; and providing for the content of the school leadership training.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-4)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State and County Superintendents of Schools - Employment Contracts - School Leadership Course or Program
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Hearing canceled
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {853225/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-4) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {883226/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - School Leadership Training Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 12:45 PM
Click to return on the top page