Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Hornberger, Boteler, Buckel, Feldmark, Ghrist, Griffith, Guyton, Jacobs, Krebs, Luedtke, Mautz, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Sample-Hughes, and Shoemaker
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and the Department of Assessments and Taxation to jointly conduct a study of the assessment of agricultural accessory use improvements to review whether agricultural accessory use improvements should be assessed using a different methodology from improvements located on nonagricultural land; and requiring the departments to submit a joint report of their findings and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 1, 2022.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0567
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Agricultural Use Assessment - Improvements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {513523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property Tax - Agricultural Use Assessment - Improvements
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {513523/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Agricultural Accessory Use Improvements - Study and Report
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Referred Rules 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page