Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Mathematics Credit - College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, Buckel, Chisholm, Grammer, Hornberger, Krebs, Mangione, McComas, Reilly, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Thiam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a student who is enrolled at a public high school to satisfy a graduation requirement to earn credits in mathematics by completing a credit in a certain college preparatory computer science or computer programming course if enrolled in the course concurrently with or after completing Algebra II; and requiring a county board of education to make a certification that a college preparatory computer science or computer programming course may count toward the mathematics graduation requirement.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0823 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Mathematics Credit - College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Schools - Mathematics Credit - College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-209 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:39 PM
Click to return on the top page