Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate Henson
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Legal Education Success Collaborative for the purpose of developing methods of increasing diversity in the legal field; requiring institutions to develop and administer programs and cooperatives related to the Collaborative; beginning in fiscal year 2023, requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $125,000 to certain institutions and programs; requiring certain institutions to provide certain matching funds; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-31)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824137/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
House 2/24/2021 2/25/2021 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-31) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable with Amendments {824137/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Legal Education Success Collaborative - Established
(   15-126 )
Last Updated: 5/10/2021 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page