Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gaming - Study on Video Lottery Terminals at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar and Hornberger
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Aviation Administration, in consultation with the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission, to conduct a study on the feasibility of granting a video lottery operation license for a video lottery facility at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; and requiring the Administration, on or before October 1, 2024, to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-31)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Gaming - Study on Video Lottery Terminals at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {963729/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Gaming - Study on Video Lottery Terminals at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (108-31) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page