Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the compensation rate for inmate labor in Maryland Correctional Enterprises to be not less than the federal minimum wage; requiring the Division of Correction to offer job training and educational courses to certain inmates; and requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to evaluate the job training and educational courses offered by the Division on an ongoing basis.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0964
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0102 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page