Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Addison, Amprey, Attar, Bagnall, Boafo, Davis, Edelson, Harris, Henson, R. Lewis, Queen, Rogers, Ruff, Taylor, Toles, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor, the Department of Commerce, and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to each have a certain staff member who performs certain duties related to defining, identifying, and compiling data regarding the workforce needs in the State and who works collaboratively across certain agencies; altering certain requirements for the State Plan of Higher Education; requiring the Commission to establish a Program Review Process Advisory Council; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1022
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-3)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Smith and Anderton)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Smith and Anderton)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Gallion)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Gallion)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {523925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Conference Committee Report {523925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {473420/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-3) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments {803521/1 Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Smith and Anderton) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Barnes, Smith and Anderton) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Gallion) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Senate Refuses Recede 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/21/2024 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Augustine and Gallion) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Conference Committee Report {523925/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Conference Committee Report {523925/1 Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Higher Education Commission - Academic Program Approval and Institutional Mission Statements - Requirements
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 2:21 PM
Click to return on the top page