Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Ghrist, and Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation in an amount equal to the low-density calculation for counties that have a population density amount of less than 100 and a full-time equivalent student enrollment of fewer than 2,000 students.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/24/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2022 2/24/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-243 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:38 PM
Click to return on the top page