Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Eligibility and Automatic Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "gross income" for purposes of eligibility for and calculation of a certain homeowners' property tax credit; requiring that a certain homeowner be presumed to be eligible for and granted the homeowners' property tax credit under certain circumstances; providing that, under certain circumstances, a homeowner remains eligible for the tax credit and may not be required to submit an application for renewal of the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Eligibility and Automatic Renewal
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page