Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that the lessor of certain vehicles under a rental agreement or a loaner agreement containing a collision damage waiver provide the waiver in a specified form; requiring motor vehicle insurance policies that include collision or comprehensive coverage to include coverage for certain Class E vehicles, vehicles used as replacement vehicles, and vehicles rented under a peer-to-peer car sharing agreement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page