Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain credit grantors to adhere to certain rules concerning evaluations of applications and, under certain circumstances, consider alternative methods of evaluating an applicant's creditworthiness when evaluating an application for a primary residential mortgage loan or an extension of credit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223695/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Alternative Methods
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {223695/1 Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Finance 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Determination of Creditworthiness - Evaluation Rules and Alternative Methods
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:08 PM
Click to return on the top page