Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an employee from counting in the determination of a reduction in operations if the employee accepts an offer to transfer to any other site of employment within 30 days after being offered the transfer for purposes of certain provisions of law; altering the persons to whom an employer is required to provide certain notice of a reduction in operations; altering the information required to be included in a certain notice of a reduction in operations; exempting an employer from a certain notice requirement; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803796/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-24)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {803796/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (111-24) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Text - Chapter - Labor and Employment - Economic Stabilization Act - Alterations
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page