Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of Health – School–Based Health Centers – Guidelines and Administration of Grants
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health, in consultation with the State Department of Education and other stakeholders, to develop guidelines to support the expansion of school-based health centers; requiring the Governor to transfer the administration of school-based health center grants from the State Department of Education to the Bureau of Maternal and Child Health within the Maryland Department of Health on or before July 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0830
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-40)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Text - First - Secretary of Health – School–Based Health Centers – Guidelines and Administration of Grants
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Secretary of Health – School–Based Health Centers – Guidelines and Administration of Grants
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-40) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Text - Chapter - Secretary of Health – School–Based Health Centers – Guidelines and Administration of Grants
(   19-22A-01, 19-22A-01 through 19-22A-05 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page