Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain regulated financial institutions to develop a community benefit plan in connection with certain applications to the Commissioner of Financial Regulation relating to financial services; requiring the Commissioner to exercise certain oversight authority relating to the adequacy of the community benefit plans and attainment of goals under the plans; establishing the Community Reinvestment Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund to finance certain community development activities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Community Benefit Plan Act of 2024
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:20 PM
Click to return on the top page