Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – For–Profit Institutions – Standards for Operation
Sponsored by
Delegate D. Barnes
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain for-profit institutions of higher education and private career schools to meet certain outcome-based standards or be required to satisfy a certain revenue requirement and be subject to certain enrollment limitations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – For–Profit Institutions – Standards for Operation
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-210 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page