Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegates Ghrist, Anderton, Boteler, Buckel, Chisholm, M. Fisher, Kittleman, Mangione, McComas, McKay, Morgan, Parrott, Rose, Saab, Thiam, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public school to allow students in home instruction programs to participate in extracurricular activities sponsored by the school if the student participates in a home instruction program under written agreement with the county superintendent, is eligible to attend the public school, and meets and complies with the public school's requirements for participating in the extracurricular activity.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0987
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Home School Students - Extracurricular Activities (Right to Play Act of 2022)
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page