Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Addison, Allen, Boyce, Foley, Healey, Lehman, J. Long, Love, Ruth, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a landlord that offers a residential dwelling unit for rent is deemed to warrant the dwelling fit for human habitation; authorizing multiple tenants to join as plaintiffs in a civil action against a landlord and authorizing a court to issue an order for separate trials or other orders necessary to prevent delay or avoid prejudice; providing that a court may order certain relief in civil actions relating to the breach of warranty of habitability, including actual damages, abatement of rent, and lease termination; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0946
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {783921/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (36-99)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Withdrawn
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-11)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {843423/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate M. Morgan) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Floor Amendment {783921/1 (Delegate M. Morgan) Rejected (36-99) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2024 3/22/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183322/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Floor Amendment {683928/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Withdrawn 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (30-11) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-36) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 12:47 PM
Click to return on the top page