Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Allen, Boyce, Foley, Healey, Lehman, J. Long, T. Morgan, and Ruth
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a veterinary assistant to perform certain tasks under the immediate or direct supervision of a veterinary practitioner or a veterinary technician; authorizing a veterinary technician to perform certain procedures, including certain emergency procedures and euthanasia, under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to develop a certain alternative pathway for veterinary assistants to become veterinary technicians; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {853729/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2024 3/22/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2024 3/22/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {183429/1 Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 11:11 AM
Click to return on the top page