Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsored by
Delegate Ruth
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to convene a workgroup to evaluate the establishment of a regional waste disposal facility to serve Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Carroll County, Harford County, and Howard County; providing for the composition of the workgroup; and requiring the workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0650
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2021
Legislative Date
2/07/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2021 2/07/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 11:00 AM
Click to return on the top page