Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program to provide for a biennial exhaust emissions test only on vehicles that are equipped with an on-board diagnostic II system and are at least 7 model years old; repealing the requirement that the emissions equipment and misfueling inspection be performed under the Program; authorizing a vehicle owner to take the biennial exhaust emissions test at an approved certified repair facility; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0922
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Standards, Requirements, and Application
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page