Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to implement procedures to offer certain income tax return filers the opportunity to register to make an anatomical gift in accordance with the Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act through a hyperlink to the anatomical gift donor registry.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Donors - Registration by Tax Return Checkoff
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {683828/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Opportunity for Filers to Register to Make Anatomical Gift
House 3/15/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 2:53 PM
Click to return on the top page