Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Highways – Salt Application
Sponsored by
Delegates Qi, Foley, Guyton, Ruth, Boyce, Lehman, Love, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each State agency, county, and municipality to maintain certain records of its highway salt application and submit to the Department of the Environment by July 1 each year a report on its highway salt application for the previous fiscal year, including the total amount of salt applied and the amount of salt the jurisdiction had at the beginning of the fiscal year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Highways – Salt Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment – Highways – Salt Application
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163125/1
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment – Highways – Salt Application
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {453225/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – Highways – Salt Application
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163125/1 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-2302 )
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 1:35 PM
Click to return on the top page