Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate B. Barnes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to notify, within 90 days of the effective date of the capital budget, the recipient of a grant authorized by the capital budget; requiring the Comptroller, on receipt of notice from the Department, to expend money from the State and Local Facilities Loan Fund for certain purposes; providing that the Board of Public Works is not required, under certain circumstances, to approve certain contracts and expenditures to spend the proceeds of a general obligation loan; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2021
Legislative Date
2/06/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2021 2/06/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Capital Budget - Legislative Initiatives - Alterations
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-211, 8-117, 8-125, 8-301 )
(   2019, 2020 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:20 PM
Click to return on the top page