Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Nursing - Executive Director Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Cullison, Kerr, McCaskill, McComas, Alston, Bhandari, Chisholm, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, Taveras, White Holland and Woods
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the qualifications for the executive director of the State Board of Nursing.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Executive Director Qualifications - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303222/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Executive Director Qualifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Nursing - Executive Director Qualifications - Study
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303222/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Nursing - Executive Director Qualifications
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 4:10 PM
Click to return on the top page