Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Natural Gas and Liquefied Propane Piping Systems - Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Stein
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of non-arc-resistant jacketed corrugated stainless steel tubing in any building that uses certain fuel gas piping systems; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-1)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Public Safety – Gas Piping Systems – Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments {993327/1 Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Natural Gas and Liquefied Propane Piping Systems - Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act)
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-1) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Natural Gas and Liquefied Propane Piping Systems - Construction Requirements (Flynn and Laird Act)
(   12-206 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page