Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Bagnall, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Landis, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program in Howard County and Montgomery County to integrate the provision of medical adult day care services, home health care services, and medical services provided under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; authorizing Howard County and Montgomery County to jointly authorize the operation of one or more integrator entities to coordinate services provided under the pilot program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0527
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803527/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Finance 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
(   14-201,   14-2A-01 through 14-2A-03 )
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page