Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Enrollment Count – Average Daily Attendance
Sponsored by
Delegates Kittleman, McComas, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "average daily attendance" for purposes of calculating certain funding for primary and secondary education; and altering the definition of "full-time equivalent enrollment" to include the average daily attendance of students in kindergarten through grade 12 on school days in September through December of the prior school year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Primary and Secondary Education – Enrollment Count – Average Daily Attendance
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page