Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Atterbeary, and Moon
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a reporting requirement applicable to a law enforcement officer or police officer involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty; and requiring by July 1, 2023, and annually thereafter, each local law enforcement agency to publish the aggregate data of police officers' use of force as required by the Act on its public website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0752
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Use of Force Incident Reports
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page