Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Charles, Henson, Howell, R. Jones, Landis, Toles, Turner, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Highway Administration to keep and maintain records that detail all processes, procedures, and expenditures made to maintain clean highways in the State; requiring the Administration to report certain records on highway cleanup under certain State-county agreements to the General Assembly by February 1, 2023 and each February 1 thereafter; and requiring the Administration to publish on its website certain highway cleanup schedules and certain related information by a certain date annually.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page