Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee within the Maryland Higher Education Commission to study the policies and procedures regarding access to mental health services for students, examine the challenges for certain institutions in meeting the demand for mental health services, review best practices for accessing services and identify the best models for providing services; requiring the Committee to make recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly and the Governor by December 1, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-108 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page