Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; providing that certain police officers have the authority conferred under a certain provision of law; establishing an Advisory Board on the Transfer of Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that transfer of the Baltimore City Police Department will not remove certain collective bargaining rights of Baltimore City police officers; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0786
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. ?? of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {252318/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City – Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 2:30 p.m.
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {252318/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (116-21) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Referred Rules 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
(   16-2, 16-3 )
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page