Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsored by
Delegate Forbes
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) to study and make recommendations on traffic patterns, infrastructure, street parking, bicycle lanes, sidewalk width, and signage on York Road; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health and Environmental Committee and the House Environment and Transportation Committee on or before December 31, 2023.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0584
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page