Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Officers and Employees – Required Surety Bonds – Insurance Policies Authorized
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - State Treasurer)
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements that certain officers and employees of the State be covered by certain surety bonds to allow the officers and employees to be covered by certain insurance policies; transferring certain duties and responsibilities of the Maryland State Employees Surety Bond Committee to the State Treasurer; and repealing certain provisions of law related to the approval, form, and record of certain surety bonds required for certain officers and employees of the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0775
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - State Officers and Employees – Required Surety Bonds – Insurance Policies Authorized
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Officers and Employees – Required Surety Bonds – Insurance Policies Authorized
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment Budget and Taxation 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (39-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 10:53 PM
Click to return on the top page