Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Harrison
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Requiring a professional or occupational licensing board to issue a license to an individual who completes an apprenticeship working with a person licensed in the profession or occupation for which the applicant is seeking licensure, passes a board required examination, and pays applicable fees; authorizing a board to develop a standard apprenticeship program and to set the minimum requirements for an apprentice to obtain licensure; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Earn and Learn Act of 2022 - Establishment
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:15 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Finance)
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page