Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Bouchat, Miller, Rose, Tomlinson, Boyce, Lehman, Ruth, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a food processing residuals utilization permit; prohibiting a person from utilizing food processing residuals in the State unless the person obtains a permit; requiring the Department of Agriculture to provide a certain notice and information to certain persons; establishing the Food Processing Residuals Administration Fund to cover the costs of the Department for administration of the Act; and authorizing a representative of the Department to enter and inspect any site where food processing residuals are utilized.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1074
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Industrial Sludge Utilization Permit - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-26)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {263328/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-17)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Industrial Sludge Utilization Permit - Establishment
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {323120/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (111-26) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Favorable with Amendments {263328/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/21/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (117-17) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
(   8-1101 through 8-1103, 8-8A-01 through 8-8A-15 )
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page