Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Tackle Football Season – Limitations
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting certain tackle football seasons to the months of August through December for students in the seventh grade or below; prohibiting a county board of education or school from offering, approving, or sponsoring tackle football games to students during the months of January through July; and prohibiting a youth sports program from providing tackle football games to youth athletes under the age of 14 during the months of January through July.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0453 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs – Tackle Football Season – Limitations
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing canceled
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Age
(   7-433.1 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page