Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Apprenticeship Preference Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Guzzone, Hutchinson, J. Long, Martinez, and Woods
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing an apprenticeship preference program in State procurement; establishing a certain price preference for bids and proposals that will utilize registered apprentices in the performance of certain contracts; requiring contractors and certain subcontractors to provide certain information to a unit regarding the use of registered apprentices as a condition of receiving a contract; and providing for the liability of contractors and subcontractors for a certain amount under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Apprenticeship Preference Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters
Text - First - State Procurement - Apprenticeship Preference Program
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
(   14-801 through 14-806 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:15 PM
Click to return on the top page