Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the requirement to obtain a certain entertainment permit does not apply to the holder of a certain license under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain license holder to offer entertainment when persons under the age of 21 years are on the licensed premises if the license holder enters into a certain agreement with certain persons and the lease of the property on which the licensed premises is located contains certain provisions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0739
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
(   26-102, 26-1103, 26-1616 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page