Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the alcoholic beverages licenses for which the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County may issue a Sunday off-sale permit; authorizing the Board to issue a Sunday off-sale permit to the holder of any Class A alcoholic beverages license, or to the holder of any Class B alcoholic beverages license with an off-sale privilege; altering a certain reinvestment requirement for an applicant for a Sunday off-sale permit; requiring the Board, by January 1, 2023, to conduct a study of Sunday off-sale permits; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {564833/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743398/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {734833/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable with Amendments {564833/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-20
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable with Amendments {743398/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Floor Amendment {734833/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page