Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentine, Buckel, McComas, Miller, Munoz, Rose, Tomlinson, Wivell, Simmons, Arikan, Taylor, Grammer, Conaway, and Kaufman
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding positive community feedback that was not solicited by the police officer who is the subject of the feedback to the list of records that are not considered personnel records; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop a process for citizens to submit positive community feedback; requiring each law enforcement agency to adopt the uniform citizen positive community feedback process; and requiring a law enforcement agency to maintain a certain record that is subject to public inspection.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0007
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0682 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {193229/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bartlett, Valentine and Williams)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bartlett, Valentine and Williams)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {193229/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Agencies - Positive Community Feedback
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {303022/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bartlett, Valentine and Williams) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Requests Senate Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Bartlett, Valentine and Williams) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Motion Reconsider Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Motion Withdraw Amendments (Senator Smith) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 9:32 AM
Click to return on the top page