Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Interscholastic Athletics - Student Eligibility Waiver and School Classification
Sponsored by
Delegates Grossman and Wims
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Board of Education to waive a certain eligibility requirement for participation in interscholastic athletics at a certain Maryland Public Secondary Schools Athletic Association member school for students who attend certain public high schools; requiring the Washington County Superintendent of Schools to report to the Maryland Public Secondary Schools Athletic Association the school enrollment of member schools in grades 9, 10, and 11 as of September 30 of each even-numbered year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0851
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {213826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Interscholastic Athletics - Student Eligibility Waiver and School Classification
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {213826/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington County - Interscholastic Athletics - Student Eligibility Waiver and School Classification
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 4/06/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Second Reading Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-142 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 10:36 AM
Click to return on the top page