Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a landlord from increasing a tenant's rent during a certain lease term if the landlord violates a requirement that the landlord provide notification of an increase in rent; and prohibiting a landlord from taking certain retaliatory actions as a result of the inability to increase the tenant's rent.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {353122/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition
House 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {353122/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Leases - Rent Increase Prohibition
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:15 PM
Click to return on the top page