Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Goals and Outreach Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Phillips, Boafo, Harris, J. Long, McCaskill, Pasteur, Roberson, Roberts, White Holland, Wilkins, Williams, Woods, Alston, Bagnall, Bhandari, Chisholm, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, Hutchinson, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, R. Lewis, Lopez, Martinez, M. Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Rosenberg, Szeliga, and Taveras
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing a participation goal from a minimum of 15% to 20% for certain small businesses for certain procurement contracts; requiring the certification agency, in consultation with Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to develop an outreach program to increase the participation of small businesses that are owned by economically disadvantaged individuals; requiring, by each December 1, the certification agency to submit a report on the outreach program and the dollar amount of certain awards; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0673
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453021/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement - Small and Minority Business Reserve Program (Parren J. Mitchell MBE Prime Contracting Act)
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {453021/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement - Small Business Reserve Program - Goals and Outreach Program
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page