Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a business that maintains personal information of an individual residing in the State to implement and maintain reasonable security procedures and practices that are appropriate to the nature of the personal information maintained; and altering certain requirements related to notifications of breaches of the security of systems, including the circumstances under which the owner or licensee of certain computerized data is required to notify certain individuals of a breach.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0643
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493324/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-35)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable with Amendments {493324/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453922/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-35) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 502
Text - Chapter - Commercial Law – Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page