Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Voter Registration Link - Posting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Fair
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to post on the main page of its website a link to the voter registration webpage maintained on the website of the State Board of Elections or the local board of elections of that county and a certain statement; and requiring a user to be prompted to verify the user's age is at least 16 years old on selecting the link to the voter registration webpage.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Voter Registration Link - Posting Requirement
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-142 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page