Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $20,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old; increasing to $10,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0370
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
(   10-207, 10-209 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page