Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Locally Operated Transit Systems - Mandatory Funding
Sponsored by
Delegates Edelson, Harris, Ivey, D. Jones, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2026, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation from the Transportation Trust Fund of $80,533,314 for the Locally Operated Transit System Grant Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1125
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/09/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-20)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-7)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Locally Operated Transit Systems - Mandatory Funding
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Locally Operated Transit Systems - Mandatory Funding
House 3/18/2024 3/09/2024 Third Reading Passed (107-20) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Budget and Taxation 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Favorable 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator King) Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Adopted 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Third Reading Passed (36-7) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:58 PM
Click to return on the top page