Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering requirements relating to participation in the Maryland Transit Administration's Disabled Reduced Fare Program by certain opioid treatment program by requiring the Administration to allow opioid treatment programs to certify eligibility for and issue identification cards and monthly transit passes to qualifying patients; requiring rather than authorizing participating opioid treatment programs to issue the identification cards and transit passes to patients on-site; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration – Disabled Reduced Fare Program for Opioid Treatment Program Patients – Modifications
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:18 PM
Click to return on the top page